Otinix
WebJuan Molins Amat is a businessperson who has been at the helm of 10 different companies. He holds the position of Chairman for Cementos Molins SA, Chairman of Cemolins Internacional SL, Chairman of... WebThis paper discusses the causes of El nino, and any relation of its increased frequency with climate change and global warming. The gives details on the definition of El nino and …
Otinix
Did you know?
WebVicepresid.: VALCABALER SL Consejero: OTINIX SA Miem.Com.Ej.: OTINIX SA Presi... Ceses/Dimisiones: details: 2015-07-13: Boletín Oficial del Registro Mercantil (Spain) Denominación y forma adoptada: OTINIX SL. Transformación de sociedad: details: 2015-07-13: Boletín Oficial del Registro Mercantil (Spain) WebContato Profissional: [email protected] Curtiu o vídeo? Deixe seu like e se inscreva! Enjoyed the video? Leave your like and sign up! ♥ Inscreva-...
WebOtinix Sa left the position of Presidente in July de 2002. This company has its headquarters in Barcelona and undertakes its business in the ampliar en: ?produccion y venta de … WebDie letzten Insidertransaktionen abrufen für Cementos Molins SA (CMO). Alle Insiderkäufe und -verkäufe und Directors' Dealings
WebVer opiniones sobre Otinix España. Foro sobre ganancias, informaciones sobre los sueldos, los supervisores, el ambiente, ofertas de trabajo, dirección, número... WebVAT Number of Otinix S.A. Financials. Financial Statement (Annual Accounts) Details. Company type: Sociedad Anónima (Public Limited Company), Active: VAT Number (CIF) …
WebNombre: OTINIX SL. Razón social: OTINIX SL. CIF: B58772914. Actividad: ASESORIA FINANCIERA Y DE INVERSIONES. Dirección: PASSEIG DE GRACIA 92 08008 - BARCELONA (BARCELONA) Si es tu empresa y quieres modificar o añadir algún dato, puedes hacerlo ahora. Editar. Empresas cercanas.
WebAug 23, 2010 · Empresa OTINIX SA Con fecha 11 de junio de 2015 se inscribe en el Registro Mercantil el nombramiento de Molins Lopez Rodo Maria Regina como Consejero Delegado de la sociedad. Fuente: Boletín Oficial del Registro Mercantil Fecha inscripción: 11/06/2015 T 43053, F 71, S 8, H B 53048, I/A 30 . 3 Jun 2015 ... is magna or summa higherWebgestionar y dirigir las participaciones significativas en otras sociedades, que representen al menos el 5 de su capital social. is magnavox a good brandWebJun 26, 1997 · Otinix Sociedad Anonima. Nuestros informes le proporcionarán toda la información sobre los cargos nombrados por sociedades cuyo nombre coincida con Otinix Sociedad Anonima, con el detalle de los cargos actuales y de los cargos ocupados históricamente, ordenados cronológicamente.Nuestro exclusivo cronograma de cargos le … kia soul clutch switchWebOTINIX SL. Información mercantil de la empresa . Cargos directivos y actos publicados en el BORME. Entrar Prueba nuestra API; Entrar Prueba nuestra API; kia soul competitionWebJoaquín Maria Molins López-Rodó is Professor-Emeritus at the University of Barcelona and on the board of 5 other companies. In his past career he held the position of Professor at European University... is magnavox still aroundWebby Otinix Freddy. This paper discusses the causes of El nino, and any relation of its increased frequency with climate change and global warming. The gives details on the definition of El nino and causes and the impacts it has … is magnalite cookware still madeWebDatos destacados del BORME de OTINIX SL. Aumento Capital. 2.291.102,15 Euros 23/05/2024. Result. Suscrito. 31.075.907,00 Euros. Últimas cuentas. 2024 Consigue AHORA las cuentas Anuales de OTINIX SL. Auditor Cuentas. PLETA AUDITORES SLP ¿Qué es La TAyA? La TAYA es un ... kia soul comparable vehicles